TN SB1350 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from 30 business days to 20 business days after issuance of the notice of assessment the time by which an ambulance provider must pay the assessment to the bureau of TennCare. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Title
As introduced, changes from 30 business days to 20 business days after issuance of the notice of assessment the time by which an ambulance provider must pay the assessment to the bureau of TennCare. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 6/3/2020 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0915 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-07 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.