TN SB1355 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 397
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 397
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing the filing of a vacancy in the state senate when the vacancy occurs within 45 days of the election. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing the filing of a vacancy in the state senate when the vacancy occurs within 45 days of the election. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Randy McNally [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 397 | |
2019-05-15 | Effective date(s) 05/10/2019 | |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-30 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0085) |
2019-04-30 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 1 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0036) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/7/2019 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/7/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/28/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0185 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 397