TN SB1356 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds administrators of elections to the list of county general officers for purposes of determining compensation; requires counties to compensate administrators as general officers; establishes certain minimum hours for election commission offices in counties with certified administrators of elections. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 8, Chapter 24.
Title
As introduced, adds administrators of elections to the list of county general officers for purposes of determining compensation; requires counties to compensate administrators as general officers; establishes certain minimum hours for election commission offices in counties with certified administrators of elections. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 8, Chapter 24.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1355 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Failed in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee