TN SB1379 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 469
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 469
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases, from $600 to $1,000, the amount of a Tennessee middle college scholarship awarded each semester to an eligible student for full-time attendance. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
As enacted, increases, from $600 to $1,000, the amount of a Tennessee middle college scholarship awarded each semester to an eligible student for full-time attendance. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 469 | |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0745 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 469