TN SB1414 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, permits the utility management review board to authorize the voluntary sale of all or part of the assets of a utility district to a public utility if certain conditions are met. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 82, Part 7 and Section 65-4-101.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, permits the utility management review board to authorize the voluntary sale of all or part of the assets of a utility district to a public utility if certain conditions are met. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 82, Part 7 and Section 65-4-101.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
2019-03-26SenateReset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-03-12SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1281 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-26 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback