TN SB1417 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds authorization for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption for: Weir Park in Clay County; Center for the Arts in Murfreesboro; El Fogon restaurant in Hixson; Lebanon Theater; the Blake at Kingsport; Legacy Farms in Lebanon; Flat Hollow Marina in Campbell County; the 121 Hotel in Nashville; Central Park in Livingston; and the Sip-n-Scoop in College Grove. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Title
As enacted, adds authorization for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption for: Weir Park in Clay County; Center for the Arts in Murfreesboro; El Fogon restaurant in Hixson; Lebanon Theater; the Blake at Kingsport; Legacy Farms in Lebanon; Flat Hollow Marina in Campbell County; the 121 Hotel in Nashville; Central Park in Livingston; and the Sip-n-Scoop in College Grove. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2 (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 363 | |
2019-05-15 | Effective date(s) 05/10/2019 | |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-05-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 26, Nays 1, PNV 1 (Amendment 2 - HA0439) |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 72, Nays 19, PNV 1 |
2019-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0317) |
2019-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0439) |
2019-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 3, PNV 2 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/14/2019 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/14/2019 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/11/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1070 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 363