TN SB1450 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the closure of all county and municipal school systems and special school districts on Veterans' Day. - Amends TCA Title 15 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the closure of all county and municipal school systems and special school districts on Veterans' Day. - Amends TCA Title 15 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0826 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-14 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee