TN SB1496 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, exempts farm tractors and implements of husbandry from the requirement that slow-moving vehicles pull off the roadway on certain highways. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.
Title
As enacted, exempts farm tractors and implements of husbandry from the requirement that slow-moving vehicles pull off the roadway on certain highways. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Pub. Ch. 76 | |
2019-04-09 | Effective date(s) 03/28/2019 | |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-03-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-03-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-03-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/11/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0696 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 76