TN SB1527 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, reduces the maximum penalty levied by the municipal court from $500 to $50; removes the certification requirement for newly elected councilmen; removes city council authority to impeach; allows council to appoint a city administrator; removes the city clerk bond requirement; revises various other provisions. - Amends Chapter 128 of the Private Acts of 1990; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, reduces the maximum penalty levied by the municipal court from $500 to $50; removes the certification requirement for newly elected councilmen; removes city council authority to impeach; allows council to appoint a city administrator; removes the city clerk bond requirement; revises various other provisions. - Amends Chapter 128 of the Private Acts of 1990; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 12 | |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1519 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pr. Ch. 12