TN SB1546 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, rewrites city charter. - Amends Chapter 23 of the Private Acts of 2011.
Title
Subject to local approval, rewrites city charter. - Amends Chapter 23 of the Private Acts of 2011.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 34 | |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1536 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pr. Ch. 34