TN SB1551 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, creates a municipal court. - Amends Chapter 274 of the Private Acts of 1924; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, creates a municipal court. - Amends Chapter 274 of the Private Acts of 1924; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 36 | |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 5/2/2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Consent Calendar 2 for 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1543 (Crossfiled) 2019-06-06 - Pr. Ch. 36