TN SB1574 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds the government operations committees to the list of committees that are to receive a copy of the consolidated report on the Help America Vote Act from the secretary of state each year. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 40, Chapter 29.
Title
As introduced, adds the government operations committees to the list of committees that are to receive a copy of the consolidated report on the Help America Vote Act from the secretary of state each year. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 40, Chapter 29.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1837 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-27 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.