TN SB1614 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes prohibition on a member of a local governing body who is also an employee of the local governing body from voting on matters in which the member has a conflict of interest, and reinstates the declaration of conflict prior to voting. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 12.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, removes prohibition on a member of a local governing body who is also an employee of the local governing body from voting on matters in which the member has a conflict of interest, and reinstates the declaration of conflict prior to voting. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 12.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2020-01-16SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-01-14SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1607 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-15 - Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback