TN SB1626 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 676
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 676
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions regarding public records. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions regarding public records. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 676 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 06/15/2020 | |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-02 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-02 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0630) |
2020-06-02 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0520) |
2020-06-02 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-02-24 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0484) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0483) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/20/2020 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/11/2020 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2/11/2020 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/4/2020 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1632 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 676