TN SB1690 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 726
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 726
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows voter who was issued an absentee ballot to vote a provisional ballot. - Amends TCA Section 2-6-301 and Section 2-7-112.
Title
As enacted, allows voter who was issued an absentee ballot to vote a provisional ballot. - Amends TCA Section 2-6-301 and Section 2-7-112.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-27 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-27 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Pub. Ch. 726 | |
2018-04-23 | Effective date(s) 04/18/2018 | |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-02 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-02 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/5/2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/20/2018 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1578 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 726