TN SB1749 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 571
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 571
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes issuance of special purpose boat dealer plates to manufacturers and dealers who hire operators of boat trailers to transport boats to customers. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, authorizes issuance of special purpose boat dealer plates to manufacturers and dealers who hire operators of boat trailers to transport boats to customers. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 571 | |
2020-03-26 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2020 | |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-03-02 | House | Passed H., Ayes 99, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-03-02 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/2/2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/19/2020 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1614 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 571