TN SB1757 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a select oversight committee on corrections. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
As introduced, creates a select oversight committee on corrections. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 40 and Title 41.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with a negative recommendation, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/26/2020 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1877 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Failed for lack of second in: Corrections Subcommittee