TN SB1861 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes telegraph services from the list of services provided by a municipality operating an electric plant. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 65 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, removes telegraph services from the list of services provided by a municipality operating an electric plant. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 65 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1646 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-22 - Assigned to s/c Utilities Subcommittee