TN SB1862 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 721
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 721
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a county, upon two-thirds vote of the county legislative body, to dispose of real property at a nominal cost by private negotiation and sale to a 501(c)(3) nonprofit corporation, incorporated under the laws of this state, whose purpose includes educational services to youth in areas including health, science, agriculture, and civic engagement through in-school and after-school programs and school and community clubs and camps. - Amends TCA Title 5.
Title
As enacted, authorizes a county, upon two-thirds vote of the county legislative body, to dispose of real property at a nominal cost by private negotiation and sale to a 501(c)(3) nonprofit corporation, incorporated under the laws of this state, whose purpose includes educational services to youth in areas including health, science, agriculture, and civic engagement through in-school and after-school programs and school and community clubs and camps. - Amends TCA Title 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 721 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 06/22/2020 | |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/2/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1857 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 721