TN SB1864 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, entitles certain public employees who are employed in a position requiring mandatory age-based retirement to establish retirement credit for honorable military service during certain periods of armed conflict. - Amends TCA Section 8-34-605 and Section 8-36-205.
Title
As introduced, entitles certain public employees who are employed in a position requiring mandatory age-based retirement to establish retirement credit for honorable military service during certain periods of armed conflict. - Amends TCA Section 8-34-605 and Section 8-36-205.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Powers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1878 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee