TN SB1909 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases, from 15 to 20 the number of days after the sale or termination of a business within which the operator of the business must notify the local assessor and pay any personal property taxes due on account of the operation of the business. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, increases, from 15 to 20 the number of days after the sale or termination of a business within which the operator of the business must notify the local assessor and pay any personal property taxes due on account of the operation of the business. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1928 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Failed in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Committee