TN SB1917 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires, beginning with the 2020-2021 school year, that the BEP fund one full-time teaching positions for every 20 average daily membership in grades kindergarten-12. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires, beginning with the 2020-2021 school year, that the BEP fund one full-time teaching positions for every 20 average daily membership in grades kindergarten-12. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2025 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Committee