TN SB1918 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Tennessee second chance scholarship program to award scholarships to assist persons who have been placed in the custody of the department of children's services in the person's pursuit of a postsecondary degree or credential. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, creates the Tennessee second chance scholarship program to award scholarships to assist persons who have been placed in the custody of the department of children's services in the person's pursuit of a postsecondary degree or credential. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2865 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Committee