TN SB1956 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 722
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 722
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates an exception to the prohibition on an industrial development corporation purchasing a hotel, motel, or apartment building, if the project is a tourism attraction involving an aggregate investment of public and private funds in excess of $75 million. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 53.
Title
As enacted, creates an exception to the prohibition on an industrial development corporation purchasing a hotel, motel, or apartment building, if the project is a tourism attraction involving an aggregate investment of public and private funds in excess of $75 million. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 53.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 722 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 06/22/2020 | |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-06-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 6/4/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2041 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 722