TN SB1961 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 791
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 791
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a municipal utility board or the municipal governing body, and the comptroller, to establish procedures and guidelines for a natural gas utility system to devote revenues derived from the system to fund chambers of commerce or economic and community organizations; requires certain financial reporting by entities receiving such funds. - Amends TCA Section 7-34-115.
Title
As enacted, requires a municipal utility board or the municipal governing body, and the comptroller, to establish procedures and guidelines for a natural gas utility system to devote revenues derived from the system to fund chambers of commerce or economic and community organizations; requires certain financial reporting by entities receiving such funds. - Amends TCA Section 7-34-115.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Amend# 1 by Dickerson (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Amend# 1 by Dickerson (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Pub. Ch. 791 | |
2020-07-22 | Effective date(s) 01/01/2021 | |
2020-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-17 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-17 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0605) |
2020-06-17 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-09 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0539) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/5/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1633 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 791