TN SB1977 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allocates sales and use tax revenues for a special district to an eligible county or a municipality within the eligible county that is economically distressed for the purpose of funding certain capital outlay or other projects; establishes requirements for such allocation. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, allocates sales and use tax revenues for a special district to an eligible county or a municipality within the eligible county that is economically distressed for the purpose of funding certain capital outlay or other projects; establishes requirements for such allocation. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2015 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-04 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee