TN SB1993 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Permit Freedom Act," which requires local governmental entities to make final determinations and provide certain information with regard to forms of permission required to engage in constitutionally protected activities within certain time frames; creates cause of action for applicants. - Amends TCA Title 1; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 38; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Permit Freedom Act," which requires local governmental entities to make final determinations and provide certain information with regard to forms of permission required to engage in constitutionally protected activities within certain time frames; creates cause of action for applicants. - Amends TCA Title 1; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 38; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1978 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee