TN SB1998 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, decreases penalty for manufacturer mislabeling whiskey as Tennessee whiskey from suspension or revocation of the manufacturer's license for a period of not less than one year to a period of not greater than one year. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
As introduced, decreases penalty for manufacturer mislabeling whiskey as Tennessee whiskey from suspension or revocation of the manufacturer's license for a period of not less than one year to a period of not greater than one year. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2358 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee