TN SB2044 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that a charter commission member's term of office ends the shorter of two years from the date of election or the date a proposed charter is filed with the county election commission for purposes of filing statements of interest. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10, Part 1; Title 5, Chapter 1, Part 2; Title 7, Chapter 2 and Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 5.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that a charter commission member's term of office ends the shorter of two years from the date of election or the date a proposed charter is filed with the county election commission for purposes of filing statements of interest. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10, Part 1; Title 5, Chapter 1, Part 2; Title 7, Chapter 2 and Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 5.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/24/2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2411 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee