TN SB2069 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes local governments to take special censuses that include unborn children; requires that any state funds distributed and allocated to local governments based on population use such special census figures. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 16; Title 54; Title 57 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, authorizes local governments to take special censuses that include unborn children; requires that any state funds distributed and allocated to local governments based on population use such special census figures. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 16; Title 54; Title 57 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2296 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Failed in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee