TN SB2071 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a county to forgo the automatic compensation increase for county officers if the department of economic and community development determines that the county experienced substantial characteristics of economic distress in the preceding fiscal year. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 24.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a county to forgo the automatic compensation increase for county officers if the department of economic and community development determines that the county experienced substantial characteristics of economic distress in the preceding fiscal year. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 24.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2010 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee