TN SB2145 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Insurance Modernization Act." - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 2, Part 2; Title 56, Chapter 5, Part 1 and Title 56, Chapter 54.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Insurance Modernization Act." - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 2, Part 2; Title 56, Chapter 5, Part 1 and Title 56, Chapter 54.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2214 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-15 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee