TN SB2154 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 592
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 592
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, corrects a cross-reference in regard to the standards that apply to certain donations of food; changes the level of carelessness that gives rise to liability for damage caused by certain food donors from negligence to gross negligence; makes other changes concerning food donations. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 13.
Title
As enacted, corrects a cross-reference in regard to the standards that apply to certain donations of food; changes the level of carelessness that gives rise to liability for damage caused by certain food donors from negligence to gross negligence; makes other changes concerning food donations. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 592 | |
2020-03-26 | Effective date(s) 03/20/2020 | |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-03-09 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/2/2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/19/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2223 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 592