TN SB2247 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 624
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 624
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that certain provisions related to the confidentiality of private records held by public utilities only apply to those records and not to all confidential records. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5.
Title
As enacted, clarifies that certain provisions related to the confidentiality of private records held by public utilities only apply to those records and not to all confidential records. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 624 | |
2020-03-26 | Effective date(s) 03/25/2020 | |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-03-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2020-03-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-09 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/5/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2463 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 624