TN SB2261 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 734
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 734
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits the state board of education to assess reasonable costs against a teacher or administrator when a final order is issued following a contested case hearing in which a teacher or administrator is issued a formal reprimand or the teacher's or administrator's license is denied, non-renewed, suspended, or revoked; requires the state board to promulgate rules for such assessments. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 4 and Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, permits the state board of education to assess reasonable costs against a teacher or administrator when a final order is issued following a contested case hearing in which a teacher or administrator is issued a formal reprimand or the teacher's or administrator's license is denied, non-renewed, suspended, or revoked; requires the state board to promulgate rules for such assessments. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 4 and Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 734 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 06/22/2020 | |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-02 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-02 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-16 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1974 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 734