TN SB2393 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes up to two owners of an LLC that owns property in a city to vote in the city's elections. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes up to two owners of an LLC that owns property in a city to vote in the city's elections. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateAction deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
2020-03-11SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020
2020-03-10SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/17/2020
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020
2020-02-25SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/3/2020
2020-02-19SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/25/2020
2020-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2566 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-04 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback