TN SB2398 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes local governments to add the cost of a criminal history background check for an applicant for a beer permit or adult-oriented establishment as a separate fee instead of including such cost in the application fee for the license or permit. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 11 and Title 57, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, authorizes local governments to add the cost of a criminal history background check for an applicant for a beer permit or adult-oriented establishment as a separate fee instead of including such cost in the application fee for the license or permit. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 11 and Title 57, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2459 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration