TN SB2400 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the commissioner of finance and administration from disbursing moneys from the state treasury to private entities that do not pay their employees a living wage; prohibits state governmental entities from disbursing state funds to private entities that do not pay their employees a living wage; requires state contracts to include language requiring such entities to pay their employees a living wage; defines "living wage" as at least $12.50 per hour worked. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 12; Title 50 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the commissioner of finance and administration from disbursing moneys from the state treasury to private entities that do not pay their employees a living wage; prohibits state governmental entities from disbursing state funds to private entities that do not pay their employees a living wage; requires state contracts to include language requiring such entities to pay their employees a living wage; defines "living wage" as at least $12.50 per hour worked. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 12; Title 50 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1844 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Failed in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee