TN SB2405 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires municipalities to consider the number of accidents and red light violations at an intersection before installing a traffic violation surveillance camera. - Amends TCA Section 55-8-198.
Title
As introduced, requires municipalities to consider the number of accidents and red light violations at an intersection before installing a traffic violation surveillance camera. - Amends TCA Section 55-8-198.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm. | |
2010-03-03 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. E,C&T Comm. | |
2010-01-25 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2010-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-12-21 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2577 (Crossfiled) 2010-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Public Safety of TR
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2405&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2405.pdf |