TN SB2405 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 964
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 964
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department of children's services to develop instructional guidelines for child safety training programs for members of professions that frequently deal with children who may be at risk of abuse. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1, Part 4; Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 1; Title 63, Chapter 23; Title 63, Chapter 6, Part 2; Title 63, Chapter 7, Part 1 and Title 63, Chapter 9.
Title
As enacted, requires the department of children's services to develop instructional guidelines for child safety training programs for members of professions that frequently deal with children who may be at risk of abuse. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1, Part 4; Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 1; Title 63, Chapter 23; Title 63, Chapter 6, Part 2; Title 63, Chapter 7, Part 1 and Title 63, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 964 | |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/18/18 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2606 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 964