TN SB2469 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 649
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 649
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the state of Tennessee, acting by resolution of its funding board, to issue and sell general obligations bonds of the state in amounts not to exceed $124 million.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the state of Tennessee, acting by resolution of its funding board, to issue and sell general obligations bonds of the state in amounts not to exceed $124 million.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 649 | |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 3/17/20 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2820 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 649