TN SB2475 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the office of energy programs to report annually to the agriculture and natural resources committee of the house of representatives and the energy, agriculture and natural resources committee of the senate concerning the office's efforts to assist Tennessee institutions and citizens for research and experimentation, in the development of clean energy technologies during the immediately preceding calendar year. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, requires the office of energy programs to report annually to the agriculture and natural resources committee of the house of representatives and the energy, agriculture and natural resources committee of the senate concerning the office's efforts to assist Tennessee institutions and citizens for research and experimentation, in the development of clean energy technologies during the immediately preceding calendar year. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2613 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee