TN SB2485 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 700
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 700
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates the Tennessee State Fairgrounds in Nashville as an urban park center; authorizes the granting of a franchise for the provision of food or beverage, including alcoholic beverages, on its premises; specifies that the holder of such franchise is also considered an urban park center; requires certain reporting. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, designates the Tennessee State Fairgrounds in Nashville as an urban park center; authorizes the granting of a franchise for the provision of food or beverage, including alcoholic beverages, on its premises; specifies that the holder of such franchise is also considered an urban park center; requires certain reporting. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 700 | |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1642 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 700