TN SB2492 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 802
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 802
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates various locations as premier type tourist resorts, sports authority facilities, and community theaters for purposes of the sale of alcoholic beverages; enacts other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
As enacted, designates various locations as premier type tourist resorts, sports authority facilities, and community theaters for purposes of the sale of alcoholic beverages; enacts other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 4 (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 3 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 3 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Pub. Ch. 802 | |
2020-07-22 | Effective date(s) 07/15/2020 | |
2020-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment #4 |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment #3 |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment #2 |
2020-06-17 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 65, Nays 23, PNV 3 |
2020-06-17 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0741) |
2020-06-17 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 5 - HA1022) |
2020-06-17 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 4 - HA0981) |
2020-06-17 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0970) |
2020-06-17 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0969) |
2020-06-17 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-19 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 24, Nays 5 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0589) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 3/17/20 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1930 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 802