TN SB2497 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes commercial passenger boat companies for purposes of consumption of alcoholic beverages on the premises to operate out of Sumner County. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes commercial passenger boat companies for purposes of consumption of alcoholic beverages on the premises to operate out of Sumner County. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateAction deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
2020-03-11SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020
2020-03-10SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/17/2020
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020
2020-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2341 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Meeting Canceled

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback