TN SB2501 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the state capitol commission to include every name of those honored by a statue located in the state capitol and contiguous grounds and the history of each statue in the 2020 report to the governor and general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 1; Title 4 and Title 10.
Title
As introduced, requires the state capitol commission to include every name of those honored by a statue located in the state capitol and contiguous grounds and the history of each statue in the 2020 report to the governor and general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 1; Title 4 and Title 10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2143 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-09 - Action def. in Naming, Designating, & Private Acts