TN SB2585 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 775
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 775
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts "Cooper's Law," which requires a participating provider to strive to process hospital presumptive eligibility applications within the first 24 hours of the date of admission, when practicable. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, enacts "Cooper's Law," which requires a participating provider to strive to process hospital presumptive eligibility applications within the first 24 hours of the date of admission, when practicable. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 775 | |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/11/2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2830 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 775