TN SB2623 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes the filing fee for several documents for various corporations, associations, and business organizations. - Amends TCA Title 48, Chapter 11, Part 3; Title 48, Chapter 247, Part 1; Title 48, Chapter 249, Part 10; Title 48, Chapter 51, Part 3; Title 61, Chapter 1, Part 12; Title 61, Chapter 2, Part 12 and Title 61, Chapter 3, Part 12.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, removes the filing fee for several documents for various corporations, associations, and business organizations. - Amends TCA Title 48, Chapter 11, Part 3; Title 48, Chapter 247, Part 1; Title 48, Chapter 249, Part 10; Title 48, Chapter 51, Part 3; Title 61, Chapter 1, Part 12; Title 61, Chapter 2, Part 12 and Title 61, Chapter 3, Part 12.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1624 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-21 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback