TN SB2629 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases the timeframe within which the mother of a newborn may surrender custody of the child to an approved medical facility without criminal liability from within 72 hours of birth to within two weeks. - Amends TCA Title 36 and Section 68-11-255.
Title
As enacted, increases the timeframe within which the mother of a newborn may surrender custody of the child to an approved medical facility without criminal liability from within 72 hours of birth to within two weeks. - Amends TCA Title 36 and Section 68-11-255.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 684 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 06/15/2020 | |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-03 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-03 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-02-27 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 2 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/24/2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2357 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 684