TN SB2671 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends from 30 days to 45 days the time within which the issuing judge is required to report to the attorney general following the expiration, extension, or denial of an order authorizing a wire, oral, or electronic interception. - Amends TCA Section 10-7-504; Title 33; Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 49; Title 50; Title 55; Title 70 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, extends from 30 days to 45 days the time within which the issuing judge is required to report to the attorney general following the expiration, extension, or denial of an order authorizing a wire, oral, or electronic interception. - Amends TCA Section 10-7-504; Title 33; Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 49; Title 50; Title 55; Title 70 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] | Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] |
Sen. Bill Powers [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2817 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020